Financial history ASSOCIATION OF LOWLAND SEARCH AND RESCUE

Charity number: 1150317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £180.50k £74.21k £47.06k £92.94k £48.00k
Total expenditure £201.69k £31.35k £38.86k £29.16k £62.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A