THE ROLL OUT THE BARREL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for the purchase of Rotary Barrels for delivery to groups, organisations to distribute in the designated countries for use by the local population, mainly women and children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 30 April 2012: Standard registration
- WALK 4 WATER (Working name)
- WALK FOR WATER (Working name)
- ROLL OUT THE BARREL (Previous name)
- THE ROTB TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Taddei | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PAUL BREWER | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.16k | £24.78k | £19.05k | £15.58k | £22.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.93k | £17.22k | £30.84k | £14.56k | £36.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HEALTH, SAVE LIVES AND RELIEVE POVERTY AND SUFFERING IN EVERY COUNTRY OF THE WORLD BY (1) THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS THAT PROVIDE THE MEANS OF COLLECTING AND TRANSPORTING WATER FOR DOMESTIC USE AND PERSONAL CONSUMPTION (2) THE IMPROVEMENT OF WATER SUPPLIES (3) THE PROVISION OF HUMANITARIAN AID AND ASSISTANCE (4) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND EDUCATION ON RELATED HEALTH AND ECONOMIC MATTERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Daish Way
NEWPORT
Isle Of Wight
PO30 5XB
- Phone:
- 07809456247
- Email:
- ACCOUNTS@ROTB.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window