THE MENTOR RING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mentor Ring delivers a variety of mentoring projects, bespoke mentoring, peer mentoring and befriending services to individuals of all ages, backgrounds and ethnicities, in the areas of Education, Employment, Health and Community Cohesion events, helping to overcome significant social and cultural barriers in Wales, London Borough of Bexley and Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,984 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 November 2012: Standard registration
- TMR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rajani Devi Ponnada | Chair | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tania Ghafari | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|||||
John Kenneth Newton | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Simon | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chetna Sinha | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Jessica Leigh Hooper | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Gamblin | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sunil Pulapaka | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sean Newton | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yusuf Rangoonwala | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.22k | £94.53k | £73.90k | £114.35k | £65.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.08k | £70.61k | £81.15k | £104.31k | £99.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £17.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.32k | N/A | £2.00k | £17.00k | £6.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 JUN 2023
Charitable objects
To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by working with people who are socially excluded on the grounds of their ethnic and cultural background, poverty, geographic isolation and health issues to relieve the needs of such people and assist them to integrate into society, in particular by the provision of mentoring, education and training.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUTETOWN COMMUNITY CENTRE
2ND FLOOR
LOUDOUN SQUARE
CAERDYDD
CF10 5JA
- Phone:
- 02921321073
- Email:
- info@mentorring.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window