Financial history CHURCH FROM SCRATCH

Charity number: 1147116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £46.14k £71.07k £47.00k £42.61k £55.03k
Total expenditure £46.13k £64.48k £53.36k £45.76k £50.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A