THE ANGLO-ETHIOPIAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Provision of regular lectures covering a wide range of topics related to Ethiopia that are open to anyone wishing to attend and usually free of charge 2) Publication of a regular newsletter and maintenance of a website 3) Maintenance of a library of books related to Ethiopia 4) Hosting social events where people can meet and experience the food and culture relating to Ethiopia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Angela Raven-Roberts | Chair | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colonel - Retired Robert Nicholas Harry Alexander de Vins Wade OBE JP | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tsehay Atlaw Humber | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Gillam | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cressida Catherine Alice Marcus | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lulsegged Abebe | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|||||
JOHN MELLORS | Trustee | 28 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £4.03k | £3.32k | £3.45k | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £2.65k | £3.12k | £3.21k | £3.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE CONCERNING ETHIOPIA,INCLUDING ITS HISTORY, CULTURE, ART AND ARCHITECTURE, NATURAL HISTORY AND ECONOMY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COURSES AND LECTURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 FLORENCE ROAD
LONDON
SE14 6TW
- Phone:
- 07717210470
- Email:
- contact@anglo-ethiopian.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window