Financial history M A B CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1147031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £378.90k £431.79k £651.30k £799.85k £870.65k
Total expenditure £525.00k £553.12k £722.77k £796.86k £884.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £607.07k £687.79k £780.19k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £44.23k £112.06k £90.46k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £722.77k £153.86k £884.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £643.00k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £5.97k £12.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £193.40k £147.89k £105.08k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £65.52k £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0