WRITING WEST MIDLANDS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in the arts for the public benefit by promotion of creative writing in particular but not exclusively in the West Midlands region of the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra van Lente | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Aimee Willis | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Elkington | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Edward Glave Jr | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lisa Blower | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Bi | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Dane Bastow | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olwen Jane Brown | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gregory Leadbetter | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.52k | £279.58k | £468.28k | £348.80k | £268.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.71k | £239.12k | £457.75k | £342.43k | £278.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTION OF CREATIVE WRITING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
130 Zellig Building
Gibb Street
Birmingham
B9 4AT
- Phone:
- 01212462770
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window