Financial history THE ECONOMIST EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £345.57k £598.19k £664.60k £695.39k £897.22k
Total expenditure £322.31k £393.13k £497.59k £724.23k £790.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £109.52k £108.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £598.19k £664.60k £695.39k £897.22k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £290.90k £497.59k £724.23k £702.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £76.89k £0 £0 £87.85k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £25.34k £0 £0 £0