Financial history BROWNSEA ISLAND SCOUT & GUIDE HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1146810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £36.62k £1.38k £5.90k £34.64k £36.34k
Total expenditure £21.49k £17.55k £20.22k £23.01k £24.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A