Financial history BLIND SUMMIT EDUCATION

Charity number: 1150425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £308.99k £125.80k £98.11k £83.83k £47.43k
Total expenditure £230.80k £110.01k £72.81k £79.19k £139.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.44k £76.82k £76.82k £76.82k £30.10k