Financial history LIGHT AND LIFE FREE METHODIST CHURCH WEST CORNWALL

Charity number: 1147067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £360.47k £369.15k £355.22k £314.80k £350.11k
Total expenditure £351.54k £292.21k £344.49k £341.07k £319.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A