Accounts and annual returns GIFTED AND TALENTED FOUNDATION AFRICA

Charity Number: 1149043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2024 02 April 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2023 02 April 2025 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2022 15 July 2023 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2021 08 July 2023 465 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2020 08 July 2023 830 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required