Financial history GIFTED AND TALENTED FOUNDATION AFRICA

Charity Number: 1149043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £8.00k £120 £1.00k £0 £1.10k
Total expenditure £9.70k £0 £920 £0 £850
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A