Financial history FRIENDS OF INGESTRE ORANGERY

Charity number: 1147905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £65.25k £155.17k £180.26k £157.07k £146.27k
Total expenditure £118.89k £125.55k £197.38k £146.60k £186.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £9.36k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.77k N/A £114.12k £59.95k