Financial history MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)

Charity number: 1147785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £341.80k £317.57k £341.84k £297.79k £395.02k
Total expenditure £270.86k £303.02k £302.73k £315.58k £323.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £40.65k £20.23k £26.46k £43.68k