7/7 TAVISTOCK SQUARE MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust has two principal activities. The first of which is to promote human rights, conflict resolution and reconciliation and religious and racial harmony by educating the public in such subjects through the conduit of an annual Lecture. Whilst the other is to campaign for, establish and maintain a public memorial in Tavistock Square to all those affected or lost as a result of the attack.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Total income includes £16,056 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 19 October 2012: Standard registration
- 03 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 7/7 MEMORIAL TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.81k | £2.48k | £15.43k | £929 | £16.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.88k | £23.11k | £29.05k | £26.42k | £7.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | £16.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 18 January 2021 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 08 January 2020 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 31 July 2018 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/10/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS), CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION AND RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN SUCH SUBJECTS. 2) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A PUBLIC MEMORIAL OF THE TERRORIST ATTACK IN TAVISTOCK SQUARE ON 7 JULY 2005 AND OF THOSE AFFECTED OR LOST AS A RESULT OF THE ATTACK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window