Financial history DEMENTIA FORWARD

Charity number: 1148225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £738.11k £799.00k £985.05k £1.43m £1.49m
Total expenditure £731.92k £637.29k £949.34k £1.34m £1.65m
Income from government contracts £420.81k £414.93k £582.95k £720.85k £692.67k
Income from government grants N/A £20.75k £4.30k N/A £28.24k
Income - Donations and legacies £155.27k £309.73k £234.24k £344.96k £350.11k
Income - Other trading activities £161.64k £74.08k £0 £171.61k £165.62k
Income - Charitable activities £420.81k £414.93k £582.95k £913.49k £968.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £394 £264 £196 £587 £1.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 £167.65k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £3.00k £12.77k £4.50k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £726.91k £636.53k £941.88k £1.33m £1.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.01k £758 £7.46k £12.31k £21.23k
Expenditure - Governance £731 £0 £9.36k £22.07k £29.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0