PORTSMOUTH DOWN SYNDROME ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Portsmouth Down Syndrome Association provides support, advice and educational services for children and their families in South Hampshire. We offer an extensive range of services including early development sessions for preschool children, communication therapy, parent and professional training days and a school outreach service. We also hold social events, drama groups and seasonal parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,981 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 21 May 2012: Standard registration
- FOOTPRINTS (Working name)
- PORTSMOUTH DOWN SYNDROME ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- PORTSMOUTH DSA (Working name)
- PORTSMOUTH DOWN SYNDROME ASSOCIATION(FOOTPRINTS) (Previous name)
- PORTSMOUTH DOWN SYNDROME SUPPORT GROUP (FOOTPRINTS) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Ross MBE | Chair | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alice Osborne | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Nelson | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ken Ross | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|||||
SIMON CHRISTOPHER BROCK | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £430.00k | £130.71k | £208.27k | £197.29k | £251.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £241.45k | £120.09k | £193.99k | £280.13k | £395.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £13.60k | £16.00k | £4.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2012
Charitable objects
(1)TO OFFER SUPPORT AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN WITH DOWN SYNDROME OR ADDITIONAL NEEDS, LIVING IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF PORTSMOUTH OR SURROUNDING AREAS. (2)PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF CHILDREN WITH DOWN SYNDROME OR ADDITIONAL NEEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES WITHIN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF PORTSMOUTH OR SURROUNDING AREAS. (3)ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND GENERAL PUBLIC WHEN POSSIBLE ON THE SUBJECT OF CHILDHOOD DISABILITY AND ITS IMPLICATIONS FOR THE FAMILY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
Aspen House
Airport Service Road
PORTSMOUTH
HAMPSHIRE
PO3 5RA
- Phone:
- 00000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window