Financial history The Peggy and Mollie Thomas Charitable Trust

Charity number: 1149224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £122.56k £28.00k £28.95k £36.43k £33.37k
Total expenditure £18.56k £22.91k £26.04k £40.48k £41.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A