BROCKHOLES WOOD FIRST FOUNDATIONS NURSERY

Charity number: 1150961
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pre school nursery whose objects are specifically restricted to enhancing the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016

Total income: £160,985
Total expenditure: £240,070

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2013: Standard registration
  • 15 August 2016: Funds transferred to 702233 COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF LANCASHIRE
  • 16 December 2016: Funds transferred to 702233 COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF LANCASHIRE
  • 16 December 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/03/2016
Total gross income £175.46k £220.18k £160.99k
Total expenditure £165.93k £206.42k £240.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 30 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 30 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 28 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 28 July 2014 On Time