BRIGHT FUTURES FOR AFRICAN CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of educational supplies to children in West African Countries Erection of school building to enhance the advancement of education in Africa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nigeria
Governance
- 20 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthonia Adesola Irukwu | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|||||
IFECHUKWU HENRY NNATUANYA | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Zainab Abisola Levy-Beard | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | £10.50k | £70 | £5.52k | £10.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.06k | £3.79k | £8.72k | £7.17k | £13.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 27 April 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 APR 2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE DEFINED BY THE CHARITIES ACT 2006 (OR ANY SUBSEQUENT LEGISLATION) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND OTHER RESOURCES FOR SPECIFICALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AMONG THE DISADVANTAGED, MARGINALISED, VULNERABLE, NEEDY AND INCAPACITATED PEOPLES WORLDWIDE, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) CHILDREN IN AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Alison Close
Eastcote
PINNER
HA5 2QZ
- Phone:
- 02084388285
- Email:
- contact@bffac.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window