Financial history MUSIC AT MALLING LTD

Charity number: 1150337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £46.56k £84.44k £129.47k £117.00k £112.68k
Total expenditure £45.89k £76.72k £137.72k £110.28k £115.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £45.20k £2.00k N/A N/A