LEICESTER CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims are to work for the preservation of the best of the remaining features of the historic past of Leicester, while encouraging and influencing new developments to achieve the highest standards of sustainability and architectural. Leicester Civic Society regularly monitors planning developments through the Leicester City Council online database of planning applications and related documents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicester City
Governance
- 18 June 1974: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Clare Victoria Bowyer | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Gunn | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Ann Hartshorne | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex James Lee-Bradley | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Louise Andrew | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wells | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Bowyer | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Henry Ward | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John James McNeill | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Herbert Bruno Eppel | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Haward Soper | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Allsop | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.01k | £108 | £4.83k | £4.16k | £8.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.01k | £2.80k | £4.46k | £5.96k | £5.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 1974 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2020 as amended on 22 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE UNITARY AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF LEICESTER TO: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT • ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE WITHIN THE CITY THAT ENHANCES HERITAGE AND ITS CONTEXTS • TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF THE BEST OF THE REMAINING FEATURES OF THE HISTORIC PAST OF LEICESTER AND ITS SURROUNDINGS AS WELL AS THE BEST OF THE EXISTING FEATURES OF PUBLIC AMENITY AND INTEREST AND THE INCORPORATION AND BLENDING OF SUCH FEATURES IN PRESENT AND FUTURE DEVELOPMENTS.
Area of benefit
AREA COMPRISING LEICESTER DISTRICT COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
De Montfort Court
2 Stoneygate Road
LEICESTER
LE2 2AB
- Phone:
- 07975781917
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window