Financial history THE KEITH COOMBS TRUST

Charity number: 1149791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/09/2020 12/09/2021 12/09/2022 12/09/2023 12/09/2024
Total gross income £98.57k £78.00k £139.75k £100.00k £95.00k
Total expenditure £100.63k £73.28k £146.42k £97.69k £98.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A