HINCKLEY U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hinckley u3a is a learning organisation for retired and semi-retired people and provides facilities for leisure time enabling members to share educational and creative activities. Study and activity groups enable members to share their skills and interests for their mutual benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Davies | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Limb | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Freddie Dawe | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Aston | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cooney | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Kyte | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Langham | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.14k | £22.68k | £16.75k | £32.00k | £37.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.17k | £13.04k | £13.51k | £30.10k | £35.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £928 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 20 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOV 2018 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 11 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
George Ward Centre
Stanley Street
Barwell
Leicestershire
LE9 8EB
- Phone:
- 07542545707
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window