USHAW MOOR ACTION GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We currently manage two community buildings ? The Hive and The Hut and the running of the Community Garden. Our aim is to provide spaces and opportunities for people in the community to meet together and make connections. We currently facilitate a range of activities: toddler groups, childrens activities, youth hang out space, crafty coffee mornings, fitness classes and a coffee shop.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 10 December 2012: Standard registration
- 26 February 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1157340 USHAW MOOR ACTION GROUP
- UMAG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 06 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | 06 February 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2012
Charitable objects
A. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF USHAW MOOR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. B. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION OF PRACTICAL MEASURES AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF PARTNERSHIPS TO REDUCE VANDALISM, REDUCE LITTER AND IMPROVE THE GENERAL HOUSEKEEPING OF THE LOCAL AREAS C. TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME SO THAT EFFECTIVE LIAISON BETWEEN THE POLICE AND PUBLIC CAN BE ACHIEVED IN ORDER TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE IN THE DURHAM CONSTABULARY AREA. D.IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS E. THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window