BLOOMSBURY FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1149001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Bloomsbury Festival delivers an annual cultural Festival in central London in conjunction with local partners.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £220,083
Total expenditure: £231,702

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Hughes Trustee 08 May 2025
None on record
Anna Paschali Trustee 26 March 2024
None on record
Andrew Choi Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Professor Rosalind Ann Raine Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
KATHERINE ELIZABETH ANDERSON Trustee 15 May 2020
SCARLET THEATRE COMPANY
Received: On time
Professor Stella Bruzzi Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record
Nick Potter Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Tim Coker Trustee 14 March 2019
None on record
Abigail Tan Trustee 12 March 2019
None on record
Maurice Biriotti Trustee 08 March 2019
THE SHM FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £190.13k £208.14k £243.73k £254.28k £220.08k
Total expenditure £188.20k £167.44k £217.91k £249.83k £231.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.00k £2.00k £600 £500 £700

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 January 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 January 2022 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BLOOMSBURY FESTIVAL
SENATE HOUSE
MALET STREET
LONDON
WC1E 7HU
Phone:
07879405262