Trustees SEEN LTD

Charity number: 1148979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIDGET ANNE WALLACE Chair 21 January 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN, EAST TWICKENHAM
Received: On time
Gillian Caroline Hudson Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Lesley Anne Benge Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Rosalind Moody Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
David Labouchardiere Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
Nicki Klass Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record