ACE (ACTION IN CAERAU AND ELY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACE (Action in Caerau & Ely) is a Charity located in Ely and Caerau, Cardiff. ACE aims to bring the community together, support community groups, manage and develop local projects, and find ways of regenerating the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,514,829
Donations and legacies | £17.94k | |
Charitable activities | £1.37m | |
Other trading activities | £122.95k | |
Investments | £6.03k | |
Other | £260 |
Total expenditure:
£1,365,052
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.37m | |
Other | £0 |
-£10,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £132,448 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.37m | |
Retained for future use | £149.78k |
People

35 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cardiff
Governance
- 10 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marian Dixey | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Davies | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Omobonike Atobatele | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Refalo | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eva Elliot | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lannen | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leyton Devril Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Roach | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oonagh Mary Scott | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melvin Witherden | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18m | £1.34m | £2.07m | £1.20m | £1.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £848.10k | £1.02m | £1.21m | £1.55m | £1.37m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £278.96k | £285.65k | £131.58k | £194.30k | £132.45k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.63k | £33.26k | £81.73k | £15.48k | £17.94k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £115.36k | £39.27k | £74.22k | £93.76k | £122.95k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.06m | £1.27m | £1.91m | £1.09m | £1.37m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.46k | £864 | £308 | £1.34k | £6.03k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £260 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £848.10k | £1.02m | £1.21m | £1.48m | £1.37m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £5.00k | £5.06k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £72.55k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £134.42k | £490.85k | £144.45k | £1.03m | £210.01k | |
|
Long-term investments | £10 | £144.44k | £1.14m | £220.00k | £969.22k | |
|
Other assets | £751.38k | £660.60k | £802.29k | £587.04k | £756.09k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.69k | £92.97k | £18.18k | £48.80k | £6.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 JUL 2022 as amended on 24 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
3.1. The objects of the Company shall be: a) To develop the capacity and skills of the members of the socially and economically disadvantaged communities of Cardiff in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society b) The promotion for the public benefit of urban regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation in the area of Cardiff by all or any of the following means: i. the relief of poverty in such ways as may be thought fit; ii. the relief of unemployment in such ways as may be thought fit, including assistance to find employment; iii. the advancement of education, training or retraining, particularly among unemployed people, and providing unemployed people with work experience; iv. The advancement of education in and appreciation of the arts, heritage culture and creative activities; v. the provision of financial assistance, technical assistance, or business advice or consultancy in order to provide training and employment opportunities for unemployed people in cases of financial or other charitable need through help in setting up their own business, vi. the creation of training and employment opportunities by the provision of workspace, buildings and/or land for use on favourable terms; vii. the maintenance, improvement or provision of public amenities; viii. the provision or assistance in the provision of recreational facilities for the public at large and/ or those who, by reasons of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, poverty or social and economic circumstances, have need of such facilities; ix. the provision of public health facilities and childcare; x. such other means as may from time to time be determined subject to the prior consent of the Charity Commissioners for England and Wales. c) The relief of financial hardship among people living or working in Cardiff, South Wales by providing such persons with goods/services which they could not otherwise afford through lack of means.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACE
Our Place: Dusty Forge
460 Cowbridge Road West
CARDIFF
CF5 5BZ
- Phone:
- 02920003132
- Email:
- info@aceplace.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window