Financial history THAMES' FRIENDS

Charity number: 1151465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/05/2020 28/05/2021 28/05/2022 28/05/2023 28/05/2024
Total gross income £4.35k £1.53k £364 £2.22k £2.08k
Total expenditure £2.47k £3.00k £89 £5.03k £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A