Financial history UP 'N AWAY

Charity number: 1150268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £134.95k £223.88k £233.12k £210.61k £178.34k
Total expenditure £135.22k £223.76k £229.19k £185.63k £212.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £15.96k N/A N/A