Financial history BOILER AND ENGINEERING SKILLS TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 1153592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £237.10k £212.68k £23.04k £22.27k £10.64k
Total expenditure £221.24k £226.26k £28.42k £18.96k £10.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £213.39k £208.53k £15.05k N/A N/A