Trustees HORLEY LAWN TENNIS CLUB

Charity number: 1150481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Allen Chair 14 September 2024
None on record
Michael David Knowler Trustee 09 April 2025
None on record
Gabrielle Robinson Trustee 14 September 2024
None on record
Susanne Clarke Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Sean Watson Trustee 10 September 2022
None on record
Robert James Wylie Trustee 14 July 2022
None on record
Diana Cooper Trustee 25 September 2021
None on record
Paul Richard FARRELL Trustee 15 September 2018
None on record