Financial history JALALIA JAAME MOSQUE

Charity number: 1152215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £132.72k £95.62k £429.82k £58.31k £0
Total expenditure £99.14k £81.82k £118.27k £41.53k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A