KINO KLASSIKA FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to support the publication of a book of Sergei Eisenstein drawings in partnership with RGALI, the State Archive of the Russian Federation, an Eisenstein program in London, an exhibition of drawings, screenings of Eisenstein's films inc a film concert of Eisenstein's October with the LSO, an academic conference of Eisenstein's legacy and preparation of film seasons generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 13 February 2013: Standard registration
- 18 July 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KINO KLASSIKA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.64k | £40.64k | £37.77k | £60.82k | £62.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.31k | £35.76k | £44.36k | £47.46k | £78.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.20k | £35.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND PROTECTION OF CLASSIC FILMS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FROM THE COUNTRIES OF THE FORMER SOVIET UNION, AS ARE OF HISTORIC, CULTURAL OR ARTISTIC INTEREST. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO CLASSIC FILMS FROM THE COUNTRIES OF THE FORMER SOVIET UNION AND THE CULTURE IN WHICH THEY WERE PRODUCED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESENTATION OF SUCH FILMS TO THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR ARTISTIC PROJECTS GENERATED BY ENGAGEMENT WITH THESE FILMS AND THEIR SUPPORTING CULTURE. (3) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window