Financial history THE AUDIENCE AGENCY

Charity number: 1149979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £3.18m £2.85m £3.24m £3.40m £2.65m
Total expenditure £2.74m £2.49m £3.03m £3.82m £3.13m
Income from government contracts £179.00k £348.08k £331.12k £343.41k £310.94k
Income from government grants £1.19m £1.28m £927.09k £1.09m £710.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £178.38k
Income - Other trading activities £339.20k £312.87k £313.17k £280.63k £209.88k
Income - Charitable activities £2.75m £2.45m £2.85m £3.00m £2.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £1.09k £824
Income - Other £93.23k £86.74k £70.00k £118.99k £22
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.43m £2.05m £2.48m £2.74m £2.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £310.40k £440.17k £555.76k £1.09m £208.47k
Expenditure - Governance £11.42k £14.49k £11.50k £14.80k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0