Trustees THE AUDIENCE AGENCY

Charity number: 1149979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Robert Locke Chair 12 June 2018
None on record
Erin Casali Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Ben Keen Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Katherine Parry Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Dr Orian Brook Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Richard Bruce Paterson Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record
Adedamola Adewunmi Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record