K-9 ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the charity is to relieve the suffering of animals worldwide, but particularly in Eastern Europe and Asia, who are abandoned, abused, stray or otherwise in need of care and protection. This is achieved by assisting the provision of and directly providing funding and other support for animal adoption programmes throughout the world together with related activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cyprus
- Greece
- Romania
- Thailand
Governance
- 02 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FERGUS TORRANCE | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA PEARCE | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULINA HOLT | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.07k | £73.08k | £43.72k | £43.55k | £69.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.57k | £37.67k | £30.17k | £59.00k | £76.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY WILL ACT AS A NON-PROFIT-MAKING ORGANISATION THAT WILL RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS WORLDWIDE, BUT PARTICULARLY IN EASTERN EUROPE AND ASIA, WHO ARE ABANDONED, ABUSED,STRAY OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF AND DIRECTLY PROVIDING: A.FUNDING AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR ANIMAL ADOPTION PROGRAMMES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. B.OVERSEEING AND EXECUTING ADOPTION PROGRAMMES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. C. FUNDING OR OTHER SUPPORT FOR VETINARY CARE FOR ANIMALS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. D.THE CREATION OR EXPANSION OR MAINTENANCE OF SPAY/NEUTER PROGRAMS WORLDWIDE. E.THE CREATION OR EXPANSION OR MAINTENANCE OF VACCINATION PROGRAMS WORLDWIDE. F.THE CREATION OR EXPANSION OR MAINTENANCE OF KENNELS OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION. G.THE FUNDING AND ASSISTANCE TO EXISTING CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND ALSO FOR INDIVIDUALS INVOLVED IN RELIEVING OF THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS WORLDWIDE INCLUDING AS PART OF PROGRAMMES WE HAVE CREATED OR ARE INVOLVED IN. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT ANIMAL WELFARE ISSUES, PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE CONCERNING HUMANE TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, PROMOTING RESPECT AND COMPASSION FOR ANIMALS AND EDUCATING ALL RELEVANT STAKEHOLDERS, INCLUDING THE PUBLIC, IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING OF DOMESTIC AND WILD ANIMALS. TO CONDUCT OR SUPPORT RESEARCH ACTIVITIES IN CONNECTION THEREWITH OR ANCILLARY THERETO; AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fifth Floor
167-169 Great Portland Street
LONDON
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 02087206855
- Email:
- info@k-9angels.co.uk
- Website:
-
k-9angels.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window