Financial history Goldthorpe Scout and Guides Joint Support Group Committee

Charity number: 503334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £11.11k £11.11k £220 £5.38k £1.67k
Total expenditure £2.64k £2.64k £1.69k £5.04k £3.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A