CHILDREN'S HOSPICES ACROSS LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's Hospices across London (CHaL) is the management company that brings together children's hospices that provide a service in London to ensure that a consistent high quality offer of children's hospice and related services is available to children, young people and families across London in order to maximise the impact of hospice care in life and at death.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 March 2013: Standard registration
- CHAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Andrews | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richards | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Coulbeck | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lavinia Jarrett | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEPHEN FARTHING | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.48k | £95.60k | £3.63k | £950 | £50.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.41k | £13.98k | £94.65k | £23.90k | £48.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/03/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF CHILDREN,YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE COPING WITH LIFE THREATENING CONDITIONS,AND OTHER HEALTH CONDITIONS AND DISABILITIES,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE TO CHILDREN’S HOSPICES IN GREATER LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Noahs Ark Childrens Hospice
The Ark
101A Byng Road
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN5 4NP
- Phone:
- 01795845172
- Email:
- hello@chal.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window