Trustees 'ON THE EDGE' FUSION YOUTH ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1152503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr FIONA ORD-SHRIMPTON PhD Chair 22 February 2013
None on record
Martin John Brooks Trustee 29 March 2023
QUINTON FOODBANK
Recently registered
Stuart Barker Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Jendayi Selassie Trustee 17 February 2023
None on record
Matthew Holmes Trustee 30 December 2022
None on record