Financial history THE GATE AT WESTMINSTER

Charity number: 1150470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £19.79k £22.63k £17.86k £20.55k £19.16k
Total expenditure £21.29k £22.00k £20.25k £20.43k £21.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A