CHELSEA MUSLIM COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes family values, religious tolerance, integration and freedom of expression. Opposes extremism, radicalisation, hate preaching and violence. Provides prayer facilities, Arabic and Quran lessons, social and religious consultations plus humanitarian aid. Contributes to Council activities in education, residents association, evaluation of Services, prevent policy and community engagement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 February 2013: Standard registration
- CHELSEA MUSLIM COMMUNITY; CMC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mustafa Abu-Lisan DL | Chair | 23 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
TAWFIK EL WERFALLI | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
OMAR OURIDA | Trustee | 23 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ABDULRAHMAN MESSAOUD ZAIDI | Trustee | 23 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.91k | £26.31k | £42.48k | £45.54k | £56.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.92k | £27.31k | £14.94k | £40.50k | £42.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £370 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.70k | £10.00k | £8.00k | £370 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 17 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 December 2022 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 July 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/08/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/12/2012
Charitable objects
5.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND MORE PARTICULARLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND LONDON, SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROMOTING AND ASSISTING IN: 5.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES OF ISLAM; 5.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF GENERAL AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT CONCERNING THE TEACHINGS AND RELIGION OF ISLAM; 5.1.3 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 5.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (II) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS; 5.1.5 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND COUNTRIES AFFECTED; AND 5.1.6 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE BOARD MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 BLANTYRE STREET
WORLD'S END ESTATE
LONDON
SW10 0DS
- Phone:
- 02070181313
- Email:
- info@chelseamuslims.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window