THE DRIFFIELD NAVIGATION TRUST

Charity number: 503430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance and Administration of The Driffield Navigation for commercial, leisure and recreational purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,430
Total expenditure: £11,573

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 1974: Standard registration
  • 05 January 2021: Funds received from 515861 DRIFFIELD NAVIGATION AMENITIES ASSOCIATION
  • 11 January 2021: Funds received from 515861 DRIFFIELD NAVIGATION AMENITIES ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DNT (Working name)
  • THE DRIFFIELD NAVIGATION TRUST (Working name)
  • THE DRIFFIELD NAVIGATION (Previous name)
  • THE DRIFFIELD NAVIGATION LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL DAVID ARTLEY Chair 17 September 2013
None on record
Daniel Phillip Backhouse Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Michael Shepherdson Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Leslie Roy Sutcliffe Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Michael Askin Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Timothy Foreman Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Jayne Hall Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Andrew Hall Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Kevin Davies Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Christian Jordan Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Colin Askin Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Cyril Antony Arnott Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Ralph Beevers Trustee 29 January 2019
None on record
Chris Bennett Trustee 07 March 2018
None on record
TERENCE JARVIS Trustee 07 February 2018
WANSFORD VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Stephen Artley Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
Robert Hood Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
Jonathan Fowler Sutton Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record
David Smith Taylor Trustee 07 November 2013
None on record
PETER MARKHAM Trustee 17 September 2013
None on record
JOHN ROBERT JEFFERSON Trustee
None on record
JOHN WILLIAM SCHOLEY Trustee
None on record
ROGER FRANK GOOCH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.26k £19.07k £12.81k £7.04k £8.43k
Total expenditure £33.96k £13.44k £13.15k £18.37k £11.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 New Walk Close
Driffield
East Yorkshire
YO25 5LG
Phone:
01377259126