Financial history OXFORDSHIRE SOUTH & VALE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1150766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £472.32k £728.50k £597.60k £562.88k £627.25k
Total expenditure £422.75k £632.75k £646.42k £578.07k £600.02k
Income from government contracts £139.86k £147.86k £252.66k £221.63k N/A
Income from government grants £289.44k £287.30k £268.11k £245.54k £394.37k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £71.61k £40.77k £47.05k £39.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £655.28k £555.78k £511.79k £575.12k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £363 £2.79k £8.20k
Income - Other N/A £1.60k £689 £1.25k £4.93k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £632.75k £646.42k £578.07k £588.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £11.20k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £569 £826 £835 £1.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0