Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHRISTOPHER, BOURNEMOUTH

Charity number: 1153390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Peter Arrowsmith Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Gay Joyce Arrowsmith Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Michael David Wyatt Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Susan Patricia Fairbairn Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Ingrid Moira Elizabeth Cooney Trustee 23 April 2023
DORSET GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Lindsay Beaumont Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
ALAN PERCIVAL TREGILGAS Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Sheila Margaret Gold Olsen Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Richard Anthony Sparke Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Karen Louise Barker Trustee 06 April 2019
None on record
ALAN CHARLES BENNET Trustee 09 April 2017
None on record
RICHARD ARMSTRONG Trustee 03 August 2013
None on record