Financial history EASTLEIGH GURKHA NEPALESE ASSOCIATION (EGNA)

Charity number: 1152693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/12/2020 15/12/2021 15/12/2022 15/12/2023 15/12/2024
Total gross income £500 £4.40k £19.49k £8.41k £8.84k
Total expenditure £195 £4.54k £10.45k £2.91k £8.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A