Financial history SPOFF'S SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1151294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.28k £15.81k £17.84k £20.03k £19.28k
Total expenditure £7.58k £19.56k £19.62k £21.33k £19.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A