Financial history MIND IN HARROGATE DISTRICT

Charity number: 1151271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £152.05k £265.62k £244.11k £254.09k £364.63k
Total expenditure £154.29k £216.23k £239.97k £268.89k £325.06k
Income from government contracts N/A £65.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £65.00k N/A £65.00k £65.00k £65.00k