OXFORDSHIRE YOUTH

Charity number: 1151723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of services for young people in Oxfordshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 2013: CIO registration
  • 24 February 2016: Funds received from 1116263 OXFORDSHIRE CHILDREN AND VOLUNTARY YOUTH SERVICE
  • 06 April 2016: Funds received from 1015127 OXFORDSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John May Chair 01 January 2023
None on record
Charles Ravenhill Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
Samuel Jones Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Nabila Hafiz Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Craig Pinkney Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Francesca Lee Trustee 26 May 2022
STEMETTE FUTURES
Received: On time
SOPHIE HAYES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Emma-Jane Hampsheir-Gill Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Isabel Dharmasiri Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Catherine Riddle Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
Fiona Elaine Clarke Trustee 27 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £428.09k £1.44m £2.84m £2.13m £2.12m
Total expenditure £419.49k £1.38m £2.74m £2.32m £2.11m
Income from government contracts N/A £9.95k £1.52m £1.41m £1.35m
Income from government grants £12.00k £32.03k £101.06k £102.03k £56.70k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £35.41k £96.71k £81.20k £218.02k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £125 £24.70k £49.28k £12.82k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.33m £2.68m £1.92m £1.87m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £78.10k £42.51k £72.91k £16.75k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.37m £2.69m £2.30m £2.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £11.97k £42.63k £15.33k £5.30k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.25k £6.97k £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A £20.95k £40.13k £26.14k £20.44k
Long-term investments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A £272.81k £432.52k £354.28k £305.08k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £203.15k £278.21k £378.64k £313.99k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Oxfordshire Youth
5000 John Smith Drive
Arc Oxford
OXFORD
OX4 2BH
Phone:
01865 767899